Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pina Vincent, Pina Vincent Troy, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against City Of Long Beach, County Of Los Angeles, Does 1 Through 100, Los Angeles County Sheriff'S Department, represented by Charles Parkin City Attorney, Martin & Martin Llp, Peters Matthew Millette, Yarbrough Valorie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Samantha P. Jessner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management460 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial765 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions432 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time765 days |
Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00(Joint); Filed by: City of Long Beach (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Proposed Judgment Following Special Verdict; Filed by: City of Long Beach (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Judgment Following Special Verdict; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Civil Deposit; Filed by: City of Long Beach (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 31, 2017Other - - Court's Ruling on Motions in Limine
Date: October 03, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BATTERY; RYV
Date: August 31, 2016DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; JURY DEMAND
Date: August 04, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2017OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF
Date: October 11, 2017AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: October 18, 2017NOTICE OF RULING RE HEARING ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2017NOTICE OF NO FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF
Date: November 30, 2017Request-Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Order-Court Fee Waiver
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPP OF DEM TO PLTF'S CPLT )
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPP OF DEM TO PLTF CPLT )
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Answer (JURY DEMAND )
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Declaration (DECL OF VALORIE FERROUILLET RE MEETING AND CONFERENCE PRIOR TO DEM )
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Notice (NTC BY DEFT COUNTY OF L.A. THAT THE 10/5/17 HRG IS FOR DEM ONLY )
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (NTC OF CONT OF HRG DEM BY DEFT COUNTY OF L.A. 8462 )
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Opposition Document (OPP TO DEM TO CPLT )
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (REPLY TO OPP TO DEM )
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Declaration (DECL OF VALORIE FERROUILLET IN SUPP OF REPLY TO OPP )
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (AMENDED RQST FOR JUDICIAL NTC IN SUPP OF DEM TO PLTF'S CPLT )
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (EXH E TO DECL OF VALORIE F IN SUPP OF RTO DEM )
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Order (TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice (of advance of the hear )
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Notice (of order )
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Order (RE DEFTS LA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT AND COUNTY OF LA DEMURRER TO PLTFS COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Filing
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Filing
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Receipt (jury fees )
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Order-Case Management
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Attorney Order
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Application-Miscellaneous
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (FOR VINCENT PINA )
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice (NTC OF POSTING JURY FEES CCH505376138 )
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Court's Ruling on Motions in Limine; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Document:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Filing Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Attorney Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Document:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00List of Exhibits
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#1 )
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00List of Witnesses
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Statement of Case
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00List of Witnesses
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00List of Witnesses (JOINT )
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Report-Status
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT )
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Statement of Case (Plaintiff Vincent T. Pina's Statement of the Case )
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RHONDA NORBERG #9265 )
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Affidavit - misc (ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6) AS TO JUDGE ANTHONY MOHR )
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Order (TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER )
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Order (TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER )
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Proposed Judgment Following Special Verdict)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Civil Deposit
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RHONDA NORBERG #9265 )
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case ((Joint))
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Court's Ruling on Motions in Limine
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Benny C. Osorio 8:30 am | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment amended on ; Status Date changed from to ; Status changed from Entered to Amended | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 97 - Hon. Gail Killefer; Reason: Inventory Transfer | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Valorie Yarbrough (Attorney): First Name: Valorie; Last Name: Yarbrough; Organization Name changed from Martin & Martin LLP to Martin & Martin LLP | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Address for Valorie Yarbrough (Attorney) updated | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 97 - Hon. Deborah L. Christian; Reason: Other | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment Following Special Verdict: As To Parties: removed | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment Following Special Verdict: As To Parties: removed | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department S10, Michele E. Flurer, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Michele E. Flurer |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department S10, Michele E. Flurer, Presiding Court Order Judge: Michele E. Flurer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.