Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Smith Rhonda, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Meredith L. Caliman Attorney At Law, against All Persons Claiming By Through Or Under, Any All Other Persons Unknown Claiming, Dynasty Dynamics Inc., Malcolm Barrington, represented by Greenberg Whitcombe Et Al. Llp, Mark E. Madison Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia D. Nieto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management294 days |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2016 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time724 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 23, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: February 23, 2018OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: October 18, 2016COMPLAINT 1) QUIET TITLE; ETC
Date: August 29, 2016VERIFICATION OF COMPLAINT
Date: October 18, 2016AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 23, 2016OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2016OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: April 19, 2017CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BARRINGTON MALCOLM FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTR4ACT AND ETC
Date: May 26, 2017ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: June 19, 2017Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: August 23, 2018Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: July 11, 2018Complaint Filed by Rhonda Smith (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by Dynasty Dynamics, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Rhonda Smith (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Amended Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Barrington Malcolm (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Document:Amended Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Barrington Malcolm (Legacy Party); Dynasty Dynamics, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Dynasty Dynamics, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by Rhonda Smith (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Rhonda Smith (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Dynasty Dynamics, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Rhonda Smith (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Barrington Malcolm (Legacy Party); Dynasty Dynamics, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Rhonda Smith (Legacy Party)
Date: August 23, 2018Amendment to Complaint Filed by Rhonda Smith (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by Dynasty Dynamics, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Rhonda Smith (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Dynasty Dynamics, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by Barrington Malcolm (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Amended Answer
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 23, 2018Notice
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.