Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Williams Cynthia, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Gulden Michael Joseph Esq., against Basit Josephine, Clear Freight Inc., represented by Blumberg Robert Scott Esq., Kang Jessica Sunghwa, Rapoport Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions860 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1214 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2016Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 24, 2019DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: November 30, 2016DECLARATION OF HOLLY WILAND IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: November 30, 2016DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. BLUMBERG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: November 30, 2016NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: November 30, 2016DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: February 16, 2017NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: March 01, 2017COMPLAINT FOR: 1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: August 26, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of entire action))
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Notice ( OF ORDER RE MARCH 11, 2019 HEARING ? OSC RE DISMISSAL)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: November 21, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why sanctions (including monetary san...))
Date: December 23, 2019Request for Dismissal (Not Entered)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE) of 11/01/2018)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 24, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: December 23, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of entire action; Order to ...))
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE))
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jessica S. Kang in Advance of December 23, 2019 Hearing)
Date: December 17, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why sanctions should not be imposed a...))
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference) of 11/21/2019)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.