Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cohen William, Dba Carole And Jan'S Moving And Storage, Martinez Edvin R, Pullen Earl Wayne, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Carole And Jan'S Moving And Storage, Carole And Jan'S Moving And Storage Co, Pullen Earl Wayne Doe 1, represented by Lysaght Law Group Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward L. Halm Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time498 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 11, 2017DECLARATION OF BRIAN C. LYSAGHT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CAROL AND JAN'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2016COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR VIOLATIONS OF 1. UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT; ETC
Date: September 06, 2016SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2016NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2016PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: September 06, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: September 30, 2016Notice
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Incoming Transfer
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00ExParte Application & Order
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Order
Date: December 18, 2017Notice of Ruling
Date: December 22, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.