Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pashaie Iris, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Smith Robert F. Esq`, against O'Gara Coach Company Llc, Rolls-Royce Motor Cars N.A. Llc, represented by Lehrman Kate S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 29, 2016 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time360 days |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND FOR RESCISSION
Date: August 29, 2016Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: July 14, 2017Receipt
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 24, 2017Declaration
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.