Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Porsche Financial Services Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tharpe & Howell Llp, against Na Kwang Bin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Frederick C. Shaller presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 25, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time153 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: January 25, 2017Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: January 25, 2017Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: February 24, 2017Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: January 25, 2017Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: January 25, 2017Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: January 25, 2017Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 29, 2016VERIFIED COMPLAINT BREACH OF EXPRESS WRITTEN CONTRACT, MONEY LENT AND ACCOUNT STATED
Date: August 25, 2016Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 24, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.