Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Employers Preferred Insurance Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Firm Aires Law, against Magic Touch Auto Spa A Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 24, 2016 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Clerk |
Case Cycle Time90 days |
COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; BREACH OF CONTRACT
Date: August 24, 2016Default Judgment
Date: November 22, 2016Default Entered
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: November 22, 2016Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: November 22, 2016Writ issued
Date: February 09, 2017Declaration
Date: February 09, 2017Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.