Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chaldaris Chris, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Eagle Jm, J-M Manufacturing Company Inc, represented by Fisher & Phillips Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ernest M. Hiroshige presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 23, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: August 23, 2016Complaint
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: September 21, 2016Notice of Ruling
Date: December 06, 2016Stipulation and Order
Date: November 28, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.