Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jiangyin Juxing Hydraulic And Electric, Jiangyin Splume Garments Co. Ltd., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Robert Gentino Law Office Of, against Leung Victor, Liang Francis, Nexst California Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management88 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions75 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time591 days |
Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Respondent D
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Document:Memo of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Document:Appl/Ntc for Rt to Attach & Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 17, 2020Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 05, 2016DECLARATION OF CONNIE PARKER REGARDING THE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITH THE COURT
Date: August 02, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER RE: AMENDED RULING
Date: August 25, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: September 08, 2017OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GENTINO
Date: January 27, 2017RULING RE: DEFENDANT NEXST CALIFORNIA, INCH'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION.
Date: February 09, 2017RULING RE: (1) PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC
Date: May 04, 2017OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY PLAINTIFF SPLUME
Date: August 01, 2017RULING RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES.
Date: August 14, 2017RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES.
Date: August 15, 2017ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: August 17, 2017RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES.
Date: August 30, 2017RULING RE; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES.
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 01, 2017NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 01, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: September 08, 2017ORDER GRANTING AUORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: September 08, 2017DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: September 08, 2017RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING, ISSUE, AND MONETARY SANCTIONS.
Date: January 05, 2018RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Date: January 03, 2018RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS
Date: March 12, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S NAME; ETC.
Date: September 28, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S NAME; ETC.
Date: May 25, 2018Motion to Amend Judgment - Motion to Amend Judgment debtor's name
Date: September 28, 2018COMPLAINT-CONTRACT -
Date: August 19, 2016NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; REQUEST TO DISMISS OR ABATE ACTION; ETC.
Date: September 23, 2016OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF ROBERT GENTINO
Date: October 13, 2016RULING RE: DEFENDANT NEXST CALIFORNIA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.
Date: November 02, 2016DEFENDANT NEXST CALIFORNIA, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Amended Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Memo of Costs
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment debtor's name))
Date: October 29, 2018Default Judgment
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment (debtor's name)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.