Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sandoval Jennifer, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Tafoya Robert N. Esq., against Sabian Community Clinic, The Los Angeles Free Clinic Inc, represented by Jacobs Mark J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth R. Feffer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management188 days |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time432 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2017COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: August 19, 2016SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 03, 2016Summons
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: November 07, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 25, 2017OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.