Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Faryab Ortila, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Khorshidi Omid Esq., against Wilson Ryan Lawrence, represented by Holmberg Brian Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with James D Otto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 23, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial818 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions883 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time892 days |
[Proposed] Joint Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order to Judge James Otto, Department S24, Long Beach; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Amended Joint Witness List; Filed by: Ortila Faryab (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Joint Submission of Requested Amended Special Verdict Form; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Joint Witness List; Filed by: Ryan Lawrence Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Proposed Joint Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case; Filed by: Ortila Faryab (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Amended Joint Exhibit List; Filed by: Ortila Faryab (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Joint Submission of Requested Special Verdict Form; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Declaration of Brian Holmberg; Filed by: Ryan Lawrence Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List; Filed by: Ryan Lawrence Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case; Filed by: Ortila Faryab (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00exhibit receipt; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 18, 2019Special Verdict; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Ortila Faryab (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 6,942.19
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Demand for Jury Trial
Date: June 21, 2017Opposition - Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Number Two
Date: October 26, 2018Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No 2 To Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert
Date: October 26, 2018Complaint -
Date: August 23, 2016ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 To Preclude Irrelevant Prejudicial questioning of Defendants' Expert)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Defendant's Proposed Joint Statement of the Case to be Read to the Jury
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Handling Attorney Change
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Joint Witness List
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Notice (Of Defendants withdrawal of specified exhibits as noted in the joint exhibit list)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment)
Date: February 11, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian Holmberg)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Order (rulings on motions in limine argued on 11/7/18)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No 2 To Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00exhibit receipt
Date: April 18, 2019Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Amended Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Number Two
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Amended Joint Witness List
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge James Otto, Department S24, Long Beach)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: February 22, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.