Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Larose Tierra, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Michaels Stores Inc., represented by Lenkov Jeffrey M. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 12, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions301 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time327 days |
Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 11, 2017DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND ETC
Date: January 17, 2017ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: February 24, 2017ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: June 09, 2017COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: August 12, 2016SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2016ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: November 04, 2016ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: April 28, 2017Answer
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: July 05, 2017Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Cross Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Judgment
Date: July 05, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.