Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fajardo Zuelieka, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Reyes & Barsoum Llp, Reyes Jorge H. Esq., against Farnum Mark. M.D., Jagodowicz Morris. M.D., represented by Lamb Michael V. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 28, 2016 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time498 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 05, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: November 04, 2016COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE-PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC
Date: July 28, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: November 29, 2016Complaint
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: December 29, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: January 04, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: December 08, 2017Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.