Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ritter Mary Meeks, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by O'Connor Michael P., against Los Angeles World Airports, represented by Ruiz Rodolfo F. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 28, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial665 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time1027 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 28, 2016Opposition - Opposition To Defendant Los Angeles Airport's Motion To Compel
Date: October 29, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel a Neuropsychological Independent ...)
Date: November 09, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel a Neuropsychological Independent ...)
Date: November 19, 2018Opposition - Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 2
Date: January 07, 2019Opposition - Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 1
Date: January 11, 2019Opposition - Opposition Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3
Date: January 07, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Police Report
Date: January 15, 2019COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 28, 2016DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: October 12, 2016Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial))
Date: January 22, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel a Neuropsychological Independent ...))
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Order (Re: Defendant's Motion to Compel a Neuropsychological Examination of Plaintiff; Motion Granted)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Entire Action, with prejudice)
Date: May 21, 2019Motion to Compel (a Neuropsychological Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to file amended answer to complaint)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to Exclude Police Report)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel a Neuropsychological Independent ...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Proposed Joint Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion in Lmine No. 2 to Exclude Witnesses Not Identified in Discovery)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion To Compel A Neuropsychological Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Joint Witness List
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Amend Answer to Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application For ...))
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: February 01, 2019Ex Parte Application (For Leave To File Amended Answer)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.