Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Janney & Janney Attorney Service Inc., Rodriguez Apodaca Law Firm Llp, Serrano Marta, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Rodriguez & King Attorneys At Law, against Jack In The Box Inc., Usa Legal Network Worldwide Legal Group Advance Account, represented by Garner Lisa Karen, Gordon & Rees Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management553 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1122 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Document:Brief-Reply Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Document:Brief-Reply Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Judge
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Declaration of Tamara Moshier; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Defendant Jack in the Box Inc. 's Motion for leave to File First; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Defendant Jack In The Box Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application... Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Motion for Leave To file first amended complaint; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Declaration of Gina Gi; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Amended Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Objection Objection ISO Reply; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Motion for New trial; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (AMENDED); Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Motion re: Expert Fees and Costs; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (AMENDED); Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Reply Response to Separate Statement; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 03, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , The Court's ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of GEG; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B302425, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $2128.04; Filed by:
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "RESP"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Tax Costs: Filed By: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Appellant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 05, 2016Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 05, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 14, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 21, 2019REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION
Date: October 21, 2016Motion for Leave - Motion for Leave To file first amended complaint
Date: October 22, 2018Opposition - Defendant Jack in the Box Inc. 's Motion for leave to File First
Date: November 02, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFEN...)
Date: November 09, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)
Date: November 14, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (AMENDED)
Date: April 05, 2019Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: September 05, 2019Motion for New Trial
Date: September 05, 2019Motion re: - MOTION RE: EXPERT FEES AND COSTS
Date: September 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: September 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: October 16, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (AMENDED); Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Reply Reply Brief ISO Motion; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B302425; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 22, 2020Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Declaration of Gabrielle E. Gordon; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff); As to: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Marta Serrano (Plaintiff); As to: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of GG; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Reply ISO Amended MSJ; Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Separate Statement (AMENDED); Filed by: Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: November 01, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF ISO MOTION
Date: November 07, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR COSTS AND EXPERT FEES; H...)
Date: November 15, 2019COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. DISCRIMINATION BASED ON DISABILITY; ETC
Date: July 26, 2016DEFENDANT JACK IN THE BOX INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: May 02, 2017Declaration Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Brief-Reply Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Brief-Reply Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Affidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 24, 2020Minute order entered: 2018-02-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 24, 2020Minute order entered: 2016-11-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Notice Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Tamara Moshier) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Motion for Leave (To file first amended complaint) Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Reply (Response to Separate Statement) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON EX PARTE) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Gina Gi) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Granting Five Addit...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Separate Statement ((AMENDED)) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Objection (Objection ISO Reply) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Permitting Addit...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Reply (ISO Amended MSJ) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFEN...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ((AMENDED)) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Order (ON TENTATIVE RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Order (COURT RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment ((AMENDED)) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date, F...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice ((AMENDED)) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Defendant Jack in the Box Inc. 's Motion for leave to File First Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Amended Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of GG) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SHORTEN TIME AND/OR SPECIA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: April 03, 2020Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Gabrielle E. Gordon) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Motion re: (Expert Fees and Costs) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Default ("APPEL") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , The Court's ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B302425, NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Respondent's Ntc Designating Record of Appeal Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 10 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Order (RULING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of GEG) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Marta Serrano (Appellant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B302425) Filed by Clerk
Date: September 22, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Costs and Expert Fees; H...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Grant Plaintiff's Extensi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Reply (Reply Brief ISO Motion) Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Motion for New trial) Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Default ("RESP") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Judgment (AMENDED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF JACK IN THE BOX, INC) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion for New Trial Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Marta Serrano (Appellant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Order Filed by Judge
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Objection Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Judge
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice Filed by Marta Serrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jack In the Box, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Tamara Moshier)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Motion for Leave (To file first amended complaint)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Defendant Jack in the Box Inc. 's Motion for leave to File First
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFEN...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Gina Gi)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Order (ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date, F...))
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON EX PARTE)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Permitting Addit...))
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment ((AMENDED))
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ((AMENDED))
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice ((AMENDED))
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Separate Statement ((AMENDED))
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Granting Five Addit...))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Reply (ISO Amended MSJ)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Objection (Objection ISO Reply)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of GG)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Reply (Response to Separate Statement)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/28/2019 and COPY OF ruling)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Order (COURT RULING)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Amended Judgment
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Exhibit List (Compendium of Evidence in Support of Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion re: (Expert Fees and Costs)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Gabrielle E. Gordon)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/09/2019)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SHORTEN TIME AND/OR SPECIA...))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Motion for New trial)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of GEG)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Respondent's Ntc Designating Record of Appeal
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Grant Plaintiff's Extensi...))
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial))
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:11/20/19)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Judgment (AMENDED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF JACK IN THE BOX, INC)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Reply (Reply Brief ISO Motion)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Costs and Expert Fees; H...))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/21/2019, The Court's ruling)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Order (RULING)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("RESP")
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("APPEL")
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B302425, NOA 11/20/19;)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 10 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 11/20/19)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.