Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Collins Antoinette, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Anthony Crawford & Associates, against Cvs Health Corporation, Cvs Pharmacy Inc., represented by Ames Dennis K. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial549 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions510 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time445 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: March 23, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MEDICAL BATTERY; ETC
Date: July 22, 2016SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 26, 2017REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2017NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 27, 2017Document:Order for Transmittal Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by CVS Health Corporation (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Antoinette Collins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Antoinette Collins (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Summons Filed by Antoinette Collins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by CVS Health Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by CVS Health Corporation (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Judgment Filed by CVS Health Corporation (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by CVS Health Corporation (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Antoinette Collins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Antoinette Collins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Order for Transmittal Filed by Court
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by CVS Health Corporation (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Declaration Filed by CVS Health Corporation (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Order for Transmittal
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Robert B. Broadbelt 8:30 am | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2019-07-22 00:00:00 | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Robert B. Broadbelt 8:30 am | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Jury Trial Jury Trial |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-01-22 00:00:00 | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Jury Trial |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-01-05 00:00:00 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Final Status Conference Final Status Conference |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Robert B. Broadbelt 10:00 am | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Final Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.