Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Trion Properties Management Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Law Offices Of Thomas A. Nitti, against Los Angeles City Of, represented by Office Of The Los Angeles City Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dalila Corral Lyons presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management97 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time754 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 17, 2016COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: July 22, 2016FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: November 07, 2016REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 03, 2017SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: January 20, 2017NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 15, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.