Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hosseinzadeh Baharak, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Office Of Robert L. Starr Apc The, against Volkswagen Group Of America Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc Marmaro presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 20, 2016 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time135 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 23, 2016COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY; ETC
Date: July 20, 2016Complaint Filed by Baharak Hosseinzadeh (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: December 12, 2016Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: December 02, 2016Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Baharak Hosseinzadeh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: December 02, 2016Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: December 12, 2016Notice of Settlement Filed by Baharak Hosseinzadeh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 12, 2016Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.