Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Asatryan Narine, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Office Of Robert L. Starr Apc The, against General Motors Llc, represented by Ruben & Sjolander Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa Sanchez presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 20, 2016 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time138 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 23, 2016COMPLAINT I. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY; ETC
Date: July 20, 2016Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Narine Asatryan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Narine Asatryan (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by General Motors, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Narine Asatryan (Plaintiff)
Date: December 05, 2016Notice of Settlement Filed by Narine Asatryan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: December 05, 2016Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 05, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.