Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Evans Robert, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Firm Shirazi Law, against Alamedine Hani, Grant Thornton Financial Advisors Llc D, Grant Thornton Llp, represented by Capell Julie M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management90 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time313 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 21, 2016COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: July 15, 2016JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2016Complaint
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: April 10, 2017Notice of Ruling
Date: May 24, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Order-Protective
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.