Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
George Vicki, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of William W. Green & Assoc., against Goodwill Industries Of Southern Califor-, represented by Berman Berman Berman Schneider&Lowary Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia D. Nieto Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time328 days |
Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: June 12, 2017Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Document:Motion for Sanctions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 15, 2016DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: October 31, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: October 31, 2016DECLARATION OF DAVID J. WAYMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: December 02, 2016ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: December 02, 2016COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: July 07, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2016Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Vicki George (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Vicki George (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Vicki George (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Vicki George (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Order Filed by Vicki George (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Notice Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)
Date: June 12, 2017Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Vicki George (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Motion Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Vicki George (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.