Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Salazar Andres, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Aegis Law Firm Pc, against Clougherty Packing Llc, Hormel Foods Corporation, John Farmer, represented by Dorsey & Whitney Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management92 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time717 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 02, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 02, 2016AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: July 05, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 29, 2016Complaint
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-07-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: June 05, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: June 22, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.