Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brin Benjamin A, Brin Benjamin A. Apc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Green Guy, Green Guy G., represented by Treister Robert B., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management145 days |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2016 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time497 days |
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC
Date: March 22, 2017REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 16, 2017CROSS-COMPLAINT- CONTRACT
Date: June 22, 2017CONTRACT- AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (NUMBER) 1
Date: July 05, 2017SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2017SUMMONS- FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: July 05, 2017Complaint Filed by null
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Document:Amended Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Benjamin A Brin (Legacy Party); Benjamin A. APC Brin (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Benjamin A Brin (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Guy Green (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Summons Filed by Guy Green (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Benjamin A Brin (Legacy Party); Benjamin A. APC Brin (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Summons Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Benjamin A Brin (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Guy G. Green (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Benjamin A Brin (Legacy Party); Benjamin A. APC Brin (Legacy Party)
Date: November 15, 2017Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Benjamin A Brin (Legacy Party); Benjamin A. APC Brin (Legacy Party)
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Benjamin A Brin (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.