Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kwan Carol Wai Ling, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Cogan John Kevin, represented by Cox Laurie S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 22, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time495 days |
Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: October 30, 2017Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: May 04, 2017Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT JOHN KEVIN COGAN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY
Date: September 28, 2016Receipt
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 30, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.