Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
National Funding Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Salisian | Lee Llp, against Kim Ji Sung, Yukinohana Japanese Restaurant, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 21, 2016 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions59 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time114 days |
Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Order to Appear for Examination Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Document:Writ of Execution filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Document:Writ issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Document:Cost Bill After Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Attachment 20; Filed by:
Date: June 09, 2020Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Ji Sung Kim (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 25, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: October 13, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: June 01, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed by National Funding, Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by National Funding, Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Writ of Execution Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Request Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by National Funding, Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by National Funding, Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Cost Bill After Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution Filed by National Funding, Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by National Funding, Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: September 24, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by National Funding, Inc (Plaintiff)
Date: February 20, 2019Default Entered
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Request
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Cost Bill After Judgment
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: February 20, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.