Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vivar-Rios Josue Ismar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Niamehr Jubin J, Wallace Bradley Stuart, against Quach Phat Thanh, Southeast Trading Inc., represented by Cullins Douglas Drake, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 21, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial678 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time1009 days |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: May 16, 2019REQUEST TO TAKE MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA OFF CALENDAR
Date: December 08, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;
Date: April 18, 2018ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: May 15, 2018Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine #2
Date: February 28, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine #3
Date: February 28, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine #5
Date: February 28, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine #7
Date: February 28, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine #4
Date: February 28, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine #8
Date: February 28, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine 1
Date: February 28, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine #6
Date: February 28, 2019ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 19, 2016Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Request
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Continuance
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine #7)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine #6)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine #4)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine 1)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine #2)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: May 16, 2019Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine #8)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine #5)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine #3)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: March 07, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 03/07/2019)
Date: March 07, 2019Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: March 07, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: March 27, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.