Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Richards Kirk, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Kruger Jackie Rose, against Lindy Office Products, represented by Goldstein Sarah K., Goldstein Sarah Katherine, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management111 days |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time133 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY FEDERAL EXPRESS
Date: September 27, 2016DECLARATION OF JEANNE KUO RIGGINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LINDY OFFICE PRODUCTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: September 27, 2016DECLARATION OF EDWARD B. WALTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LINDY OFFICE PRODUCTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: September 27, 2016Status Report - JOINT STATEMENT RE: MEET AND CONFER ON DEMURRER AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: December 02, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: November 27, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: December 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; HEARING ON MO...)
Date: December 12, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: August 26, 2019Receipt
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/09/2019)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Reversed (B280624)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions -[Hrg: 12/12/2019])
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/09/2019)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Notice (of Case Transfer)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Joint Statement Re: Meet and Confer on Demurrer and Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 18, 2019Minute order entered: 2017-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/30/2020)
Date: July 30, 2020Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appeal and Remittitur))
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appeal and Remittitur))
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/16/2019)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Mo...))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: July 30, 2020Case Management Order
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.