Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lee Myung Gyu, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Allen H. Chae Pc, against Los Angeles City Of The, Ruiz Guadalupe, represented by Loomis Richard H. Deputy City Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time715 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: May 25, 2018Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Los Angeles, City of, The (Defendant)
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Myung Gyu Lee (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Myung Gyu Lee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.