Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
De Young Linda, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Mcgee Lerer And Associates, against Does 1-10, J.C. Penney Corporation Inc., represented by Hunt Kathleen A. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time531 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 29, 2016Complaint Filed by Linda De Young (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by JC Penney Company, Inc. (Legacy Party); J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Linda De Young (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: December 08, 2017Request for Dismissal Filed by Linda De Young (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: December 11, 2017Answer (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Statement of Facts (IN SUPP OF JC PENNEY CORP INC MSJ 170428214992 12/8/2017 01:30 pm )
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (MSJ JC PENNEY CORP INC 170428214992 12/8/2017 01:30 pm )
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Answer (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION )
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.