Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Teplitsky Rozelle, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against First Sentry Protection Inc. Doe 1, Macerich Smp Lp Sued & Served As, represented by Garrell Peter E. Esq., Loo Trevor R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time587 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: December 05, 2016ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2017DEFENDANT MACERICH SMP LP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ROZELLE TEPLITSKY'S COMPLAINT
Date: July 29, 2016ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS PLED IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2016STIPULATION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS PLED IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS PLED IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: November 08, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 11, 2017Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: July 17, 2018Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: January 23, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.