Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dreher Franz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jeffrey S. Shinbrot Aplc, against Morrisey Gordon, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Wal-Mart Transportation Llc, represented by D'Angelo Bron E., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time483 days |
Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: October 19, 2017Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Document:Order-Protective Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 01, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 12, 2016Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service -
Date: October 19, 2017Summons
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: October 19, 2017Notice
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Order-Protective
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.