Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kotzkin Jason, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kaufman Law Offices Inc., against Ford Motor Company Inc., represented by Gillard Esq. Jeffrey J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management218 days |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time428 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 06, 2016NOTICE OF ERRATTA RE PROOF OF SERVICE AND CORRECT PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2016Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: May 31, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: August 11, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.