Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Min Jennifer, Min Lisa Ji Eun, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hibbard Terri, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 21, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: November 29, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2016Complaint Filed by Jennifer Min (Plaintiff); Lisa Ji Eun Min (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: November 29, 2016Complaint
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.