Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Settlemyer Karen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Donnie R. Cox, against Does 1-25, Green Anchor Lines Inc., Green Anchor Lines Incorporated Doe2, Pac Anchor Transporatation Inc, Pac Anchor Transportation Inc, (total of 9) See All represented by Riffle Edward J. Esq., Riffle Esq. Edwars J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions386 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransferred To Lasc East District |
Case Cycle Time386 days |
Answer to Complaint
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (DANIEL HOFFMAN )
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (JOY )
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Cross-complaint
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (PAC ANCHOR TRANSPORATION INC. )
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER )
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (STEPHANIE WILLIAMSON )
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (KRISTIN T. HUYNH IN SUPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN ORDER )
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Proof-Personal Service
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Proof-Personal Service
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Kristin T. Huynh in support of defts opp to plfs mtn to quash )
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Kristin T. Huynh in support of defts opp to mtn for protective order )
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Opposition Document (to plfs mtn for protective order )
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER )
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Declaration (OF KRISTIN HUEYN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICAITON )
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (to plfs mtn to quash & request for sanctions )
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Order (TRANSFERRING PI CASE TO IC COURT )
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Dismissed - Other
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE-CIVIL
Date: February 28, 2017PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL
Date: March 15, 2017Proof of Service Personal Service -
Date: February 27, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE BY F1RST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL
Date: March 02, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 03, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 14, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION: 1) TO QUASH AND/OR ETC.
Date: February 27, 2017DECLARATION OF DONNIE R. COX IN SUPPORT OF MOTION: 1) TO QUASH AND/OR ETC.
Date: February 27, 2017PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION: 1) TO QUASH AND/OR ETC.
Date: February 27, 2017Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: July 08, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: March 01, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (PAC ANCHOR TRANSPORATION INC. )
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER )
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF DONNIE R. COX IN SUPPORT OF PLFT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RESERVED FOR 3-22-17 )
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (DANIEL HOFFMAN )
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (JOY )
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (STEPHANIE WILLIAMSON )
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Declaration (OF DONNIE R. COX IN SUPPORT OF PLFT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RESERVED FOR 3-22-17 )
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF KRISTIN HUEYN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICAITON )
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Declaration (KRISTIN T. HUYNH IN SUPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN ORDER )
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Opposition Document (to plfs mtn for protective order )
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Kristin T. Huynh in support of defts opp to plfs mtn to quash )
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Kristin T. Huynh in support of defts opp to mtn for protective order )
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER )
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Opposition Document (to plfs mtn to quash & request for sanctions )
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Order (TRANSFERRING PI CASE TO IC COURT )
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department O Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department O Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department O Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 92 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department O Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department O Unknown Event Type Unknown Event Type |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department O Unknown Event Type |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.