Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Neman Brothers & Associates Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Offices Of Nico N. Tabibi Apc, against Culley Diem, Kassar Yonatan Dismissed 6 15 16, Roger Garments Llc, Kassar Yoni Dismissed 6 15 16, Phan Diem, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael J. Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2016 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time545 days |
Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Writ-Other Issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Undertaking Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: January 29, 2018Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Document:Writ issued Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: January 29, 2018Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00RULING RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL
Date: September 26, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: January 19, 2023Minute order entered: 2017-03-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Request Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by Creditor
Date: January 29, 2018Minute order entered: 2017-03-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Brief Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Writ-Other Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor
Date: January 29, 2018Minute order entered: 2017-04-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Undertaking Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Neman Brothers & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Writ-Other Issued
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Undertaking
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: January 29, 2018Request
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.