Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Raudales Carlos Vera, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Dieguez Marcelo A. Esq., against Park Seung Sun, Suneel Inc., represented by Chang Albert Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time265 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 21, 2016Answer
Date: July 21, 2016Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: October 20, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.