Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Farmers Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benson Legal Apc, against Hakopyan Spartak, Hovanesian Hovannes, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial348 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions148 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time523 days |
Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: December 14, 2017Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: November 07, 2017Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Certificate of Unsatisfied Judgmt Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: April 12, 2018Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: November 07, 2017Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: November 07, 2017Document:Notice of Incoming Case Transfer Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AMENDED
Date: June 09, 20171ST AMENDED COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: December 21, 2016REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 20, 2017Summons
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Incoming Transfer
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: December 14, 2017Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment)
Date: April 12, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.