Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fidelity National Law Group, against Jones George, Jones George French, Jones George French Jr., Toney Marshon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara M. Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management188 days |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2016 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions175 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time594 days |
Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: January 30, 2018Document:Abstract - misc Issued Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: April 09, 2018Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Court
Date: January 30, 2018Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: May 11, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 13, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: December 12, 2016Complaint Filed by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor
Date: May 11, 2018Declaration Filed by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Affidavit Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Creditor
Date: April 09, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Order Filed by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Court
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Affidavit
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Document:Order for Publication Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Publication Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Affidavit - misc Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: April 09, 2018Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: May 11, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.