Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rorty Bruce, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Smith Robert F., against Shemesh Memeged Tevuot Dba Titan Solar Construction, Verengo Inc., represented by Tagvoryan Ana, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ruth Ann Kwan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 19, 2016 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions343 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 30, 2016Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 21, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 21, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 02, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)
Date: December 23, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: September 11, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: November 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; ORDER TO SHOW CA...)
Date: November 21, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: November 22, 2019Motion for Sanctions - MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (AMENDED)
Date: December 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE - TO PLAINTIFF...)
Date: December 17, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF TAHIR L. BOYKINS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH
Date: December 26, 2019Motion to Quash
Date: December 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...)
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: January 09, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: January 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF CLEAN ENERGY EXPERTS LL...)
Date: February 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; TRIAL SETTING CO...)
Date: February 06, 2020Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: February 10, 2020DEFENDANT SOLARMAX TECHNOLOGY, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2016Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Bankruptcy Stay Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Memeged Tevuot Shemesh (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Memeged Tevuot Shemesh (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: continuances;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: February 03, 2020Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Default entered as to Memeged Tevuot Shemesh; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Bruce Rorty on
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Brief Default Judgment Application; Filed by: Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Bruce Rorty on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Memeged Tevuot Shemesh (Defendant)
Date: March 11, 2021Notice Filed by Verengo, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Solarmax Technology, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Memeged Tevuot Shemesh (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Verengo, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Notice Filed by Verengo, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Trial Setting Co...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Notice ( of Hearing) Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Order to Show Ca...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE) Filed by Verengo, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for defendants failure to a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Memeged Tevuot Shemesh (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions ((Amended)) Filed by Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Gerald W. Mouzis (Attorney)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - to Plaintiff...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice Filed by Verengo, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing (Amended)) Filed by Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Clean Energy Experts LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff); Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Verengo, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing) Filed by Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Gerald W. Mouzis (Attorney)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Gerald W. Mouzis (Attorney)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lead Genesis Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuances;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL Filed by Clerk
Date: March 11, 2021Request for Dismissal Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: October 19, 2020Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Gerald W. Mouzis (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Clean Energy Experts LL...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Trial Setting Co...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: continuances;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference status conference as to defendant Memeged Tevuot S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Brief (Default Judgment Application) Filed by Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-30 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Memeged Tevuot Shemesh (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Clean Energy Experts LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Bruce Rorty (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Memeged Tevuot Shemesh (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - to Plaintiff...))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Tahir L. Boykins in Support of Defendant's Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Lana Lucchesi in Support of Defendant Clean Energy LLC's Motion to Quash)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Order to Show Ca...))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for defendants failure to a...))
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions ((Amended))
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing (Amended))
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Trial Setting Co...))
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS SUPPLEMENTING DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED WITH REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice ( of Hearing)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Order (Court's tentative ruling re: demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation To Continue Hearing Date For Motion To Quash)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Clean Energy Experts LL...))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Trial Setting Co...))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: continuances;) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Proposed Order Granting Stipulation To Continue Hearing Date For Motion To Quash)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuances;))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: continuances due to COVID-19) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Brief (Default Judgment Application)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference status conference as to defendant Memeged Tevuot S...))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.