Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brown Phillip, Cain Shawn, Gomez Sergio, Malek-Zadeh Andrew, Oda-Gomez Christine, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Potter Donald Carl Esq., against U Gym Llc, represented by Yonemitsu Jon Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Carolyn B. Kuhl presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 02, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions591 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1250 days |
Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Document:Brief-Reply Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Document:Reimbursement of Fees Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Document:Brief-Reply Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Third Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Legacy
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Ord of Disml without prejudice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Exhibit Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Brief-Reply Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: April 04, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: September 08, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: September 15, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: October 26, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: January 05, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: February 02, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: February 20, 2018Opposition - DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2017Reply - PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2017Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: December 08, 2017Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - -NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL
Date: December 08, 2017Motion for Class Certification - -PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: January 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)
Date: January 08, 2019Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: September 11, 2019Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: March 01, 2017Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: April 04, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Request
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Ord of Disml without prejudice
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Ord of Disml without prejudice
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: First Amended Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Order (granting preliminary approval of class action settlement)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere - Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement 1/8/19)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fairness Hearing))
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Sofia Munoz with Respect to Notification and Administration)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re: Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Final Distribution Report) of 09/22/2020)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Final Distribution Report))
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Order (Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Fairness Hearing))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: June 05, 2017Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2017Reply - -REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.