Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Crawford Nicole, Robinson Kadie, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lapuyade Jean-Claude Law, against Outlook Amusements Inc., represented by Moses Evan Reed, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Carolyn B. Kuhl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn B. Kuhl Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions663 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time663 days |
Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-28T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Joined Party
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Document:Supporting Docs/ P's & A's Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (Renewal of Judgment) - -
Date: August 04, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: August 24, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: October 02, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: January 25, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: October 10, 2017Answer - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2016Answer - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT
Date: September 25, 2017Order
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-04 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Final Report of Administrator) of 12/17/2018)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Jessica Barnett Regarding Disbursement)
Date: January 29, 2019Minute Order ((Court Order re Final Report of Administrator))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.