Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Access Pacific Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dunn Jonathan J., Feldman & Associates Inc, against City Labs Boyle Heights Llc, represented by Matson Candace L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management89 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2016 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time546 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2017Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Report-Joint Status-VELS
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Proof-Personal Service
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 04, 2017Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: October 17, 2017Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: October 02, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: October 10, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.