Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Galerie Xx Inc., Storck Benjamin, Modern Auctions Inc. Dba Los Angeles Modern Auctions, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marca Matthew David, Medioni Daniel M, White Johnny, against Galerie Xx Inc., Storck Benjamin, Modern Auctions Inc. Dba Los Angeles Modern Auctions, represented by Teitelbaum Melvin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions853 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1384 days |
Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 08, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 10, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 20, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 21, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 22, 2020RULING RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: June 28, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: July 13, 2018RULING RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: July 25, 2018Ex Parte Application - Motion to Continue the FSC and Trial
Date: October 05, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Ex Parte Application ...)
Date: October 05, 2018Other - - RULING RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION
Date: October 10, 2018Motion for Order - Motion for Order Compelling Modern
Date: October 29, 2018Other - - Exhibits A-F in Support of Motion
Date: October 29, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel answers and production of documen...)
Date: December 12, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend - Motion for Leave to Amend first amended complaint
Date: February 11, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 30, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: April 30, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 21, 2019Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: May 21, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: June 06, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: August 09, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: August 09, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) RE S...)
Date: September 20, 2019Order - ORDER RULING RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: September 25, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: September 25, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: October 10, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: October 10, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: October 15, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: October 28, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: December 11, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: January 06, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: January 16, 2020Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER
Date: April 13, 2020Motion to Tax Costs
Date: July 24, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: October 19, 2020REPLY PAPERS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 18, 2018Ex Parte Application - For Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint in BC696911
Date: October 05, 2018Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 23, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: March 20, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 21, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: July 08, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: July 12, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2019Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant AXD
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Final Status Conference and Trial; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Other - RULING RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Declaration of Johnny White6; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Opposition to motion to strike; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Motion for Order Compelling Modern; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend first amended complaint; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Opposition to demurrer to first amended complaint; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Reply objection to late filing; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Exhibits A-F in Support of Motion; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Susan Balistocky (Attorney); As to: Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Order Ruling Re: Demurrer; Motion to Strike to First Amended Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Opposition to special motion to strike; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Opposition to demurrer to second amended cross complaint; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Opposition to demurrer to cross-complaint; Filed by: Galerie XX, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Trial Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Witness List JOINT WITNESS LIST; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00On the Cross-Complaint filed by Galerie XX, Inc. on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Defendant); Galerie XX, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Tentative Decision; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter/Tentative Decision) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Brief Post-Trial Closing Brief; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Judgment [Proposed] Amended Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 9536.64
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Submission; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Motion for Order for Assignment Order; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Appellant)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; "R"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued;NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- "R"; Filed by: Galerie XX, Inc. (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Scheduled Hearing Re Motion for Assignment Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "R"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B305612; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Opposition to ex parte application; Filed by: Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B305612; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Affidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Final Status Conference and Trial; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Exhibit List JOINT EXHIBIT LIST; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Reply Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Trial Brief Deadline; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Notice of Lodging; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Reply Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Appeal Document NOA: -R B305612; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B305612, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B305612; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B305612; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Trial Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Modern Auctions (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Other - (RULING RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel answers and production of documen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Modern Auctions (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Modern Auctions (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Motion for Order (Compelling Modern) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Galerie XX, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00amended cross-complaint Filed by Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (by Cross-Defendants Mode...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Ex Parte Application ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to F...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to strike) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Brief (Post-Trial Closing Brief) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter/Tentative Decision) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Motion for Order (for Assignment Order) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For )) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Transferring Case) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Riverside)) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Modern Auctions, Inc., Pur...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Benjamin Storck (Appellant)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Default ("R") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Scheduled Hearing Re Motion for Assignment Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed by Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (first amended complaint) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) re S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to second amended cross complaint) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT WITNESS LIST) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant); Galerie XX, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Demurrer and Motion to Strike to Second Amended Cross-Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Order (Special Motion to Strike the First Amended Cross-Complaint (CCP ¿ 425.16)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter/Tentative Decision)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Judgment of Dismissal A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice ( of Trial Brief Deadline) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Susan Balistocky (Attorney)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Modern Auctions (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Modern Auctions (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice ( of Final Status Conference and Trial) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Tentative Decision Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Modern Auctions (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 1) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Modern Auctions (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Answer (of Garlerie XX Inc. (Doe 1)) Filed by Galerie XX, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings: Ex Parte Application by defendant: For...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Notice (of Submission) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff); Los Angeles Modern Auctions (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to first amended complaint) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to cross-complaint) Filed by Galerie XX, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Reply (objection to late filing) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice (errata for correcting exhibit to ex parte application) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Appeal Document (NOA: -R B305612 ORDER DENYING MOTION APPELLANTS RELIEF OF DEFAULT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B305612) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Judgment Debtor Examination) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend motion for leave to file...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to stay execution of post jud...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange)) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to stay execution of post jud...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Opposition (to special motion to strike) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Closing Argument Briefs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Dismissing Action ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion for Attorneys' Fees) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to stay execution of judgment) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:; "R") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Amended Judgment Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Scheduled Hearing Re Motion for Assignment Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B305612) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Santa Barbara)) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- ("R") Filed by Galerie XX, Inc. (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Sacramento)) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judg...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B305612) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order for Plaintiff to Fi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B305612) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B305612, NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Motion for an Order Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Demurrer; Motion to Strike to First Amended Cross-Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion to Continue the FSC and Trial) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Exhibits A-F in Support of Motion Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application) Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Default (;NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Ex Parte Application ...))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to cross-complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Demurrer; Motion to Strike to First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Scheduled Hearing Re Motion for Assignment Order))
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Trial
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Reply (objection to late filing)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Modern Auctions, Inc., Pur...))
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Motion for Order (for Assignment Order)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Plaintiff and cross- Defenant Modern Auctions, Inc.'s And cross-defendants)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (PORTIONS OF CROSS. COMPLAINT OF'GALERIE XX, INC.; (4850))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Brief (Post-Trial Closing Brief)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice ( of Trial Brief Deadline)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue hearing on demurrers)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Demurrer and Motion to Strike to Second Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Reply (Consolidated Reply to Benjamin Storck's Oppositions to Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice (of Bench Warrant and New Hearing Date for Third Party Examination of Courtland Storck)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint in BC696911)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Scheduled Hearing Re Motion for Assignment Order) of )
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Trial Brief (POST TRIAL CLOSING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS BENJAMIN STORCK AND GALERIE XX, INC.)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Motion for Order (Compelling Modern)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to strike portions of second amended cross-complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Closing Argument Briefs))
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend motion for leave to file...))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice ( of Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Declaration ( of Johnny White Regarding Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to F...))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion for Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:; "R")
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Other - (RULING RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice (of Submission)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) re S...))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Judgment of Dismissal A...))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion to Continue the FSC and Trial)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Dismissing Action ...))
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Opposition ( to motion to strike portions of cross complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00amended cross-complaint
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel answers and production of documen...))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to compel; declarations of Peter Loughrey and Johnny White in support thereof)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for attorneys fees)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to stay execution of judgment)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Tentative Decision
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd amended cross-complaint)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Third Party Examination of Jason Cobb)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Notice ( to Defendant and Cross-Complainant Benjamin Storck to Appear at Trial)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Exhibits A-F in Support of Motion
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings: Ex Parte Application by defendant: For...))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to strike)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (first amended complaint)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("R")
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of )
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B305612)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice (errata for correcting exhibit to ex parte application)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Sacramento))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case))
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- ("R")
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Transferring Case)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Judgment Debtor Examination)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judg...))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice (of Bench Warrant and New Hearing Date for Third Party Examination of Denise Storck)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Default ("R")
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Third Party Examination of Denise Storck)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of )
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to stay execution of post jud...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to stay execution of post judgment in curred fees and costs)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B305612)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B305612)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B305612)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to stay execution of post jud...))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B305612, NOA ;)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to ex parte application to restrain sale of the table)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to restrain plaintiff from au...))
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order for Plaintiff to Fi...))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (For: (1) Resolution of Pending Litigation; and (2) Satisfaction of Judgment)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Appeal Document (NOA: -R B305612 ORDER DENYING MOTION APPELLANTS RELIEF OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order re: Related Cases and Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Riverside))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter/Tentative Decision))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to second amended cross complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Reply ( to Post-Trial Closing Brief of Defendants Galerie XX, Inc. and Benjamin Storck)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (to special motion to strike)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Reply (to Benjamin Storck's Opposition to Special Motion to Strike First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for attorneys fees)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case))
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Third Party Examination of Courtland Storck)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter/Tentative Decision) of )
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to first amended complaint)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of )
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (by Cross-Defendants Mode...))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Default (;NOA ;)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Amended Judgment
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Santa Barbara))
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Answer (of Garlerie XX Inc. (Doe 1))
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Order (Special Motion to Strike the First Amended Cross-Complaint (CCP ¿ 425.16))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to stay execution of post judgment fees and costs)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Motion for Order (Compelling Modern)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to compel; declarations of Peter Loughrey and Johnny White in support thereof)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel answers and production of documen...))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (first amended complaint)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Reply (objection to late filing)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Declaration ( of Johnny White Regarding Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend motion for leave to file...))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to strike)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to first amended complaint)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Demurrer; Motion to Strike to First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to F...))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Reply (Consolidated Reply to Benjamin Storck's Oppositions to Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Plaintiff and cross- Defenant Modern Auctions, Inc.'s And cross-defendants)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Reply (to Benjamin Storck's Opposition to Special Motion to Strike First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Opposition (to special motion to strike)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Order (Special Motion to Strike the First Amended Cross-Complaint (CCP ¿ 425.16))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/20/2019)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Dismissing Action ...))
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd amended cross-complaint)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Judgment of Dismissal A...))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Answer (of Garlerie XX Inc. (Doe 1))
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/15/2019)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (PORTIONS OF CROSS. COMPLAINT OF'GALERIE XX, INC.; (4850))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Notice ( to Defendant and Cross-Complainant Benjamin Storck to Appear at Trial)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to second amended cross complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice ( of Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Opposition ( to motion to strike portions of cross complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue hearing on demurrers)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer to cross-complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to strike portions of second amended cross-complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Demurrer and Motion to Strike to Second Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/20/2019)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) re S...))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice ( of Trial Brief Deadline)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for attorneys fees)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Trial Brief (POST TRIAL CLOSING BRIEF OF DEFENDANTS BENJAMIN STORCK AND GALERIE XX, INC.)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Brief (Post-Trial Closing Brief)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Reply ( to Post-Trial Closing Brief of Defendants Galerie XX, Inc. and Benjamin Storck)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Closing Argument Briefs))
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter/Tentative Decision) of 12/11/2019)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion for Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter/Tentative Decision))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice (of Submission)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/12/2019)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/07/2020)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for attorneys fees)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (by Cross-Defendants Mode...))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/06/2020)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:3/6/20)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Riverside))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("R")
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Motion for Order (for Assignment Order)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 6/8/20) of 04/22/2020)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:4/3/20; "R")
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 6/8/20))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Default (;NOA 3/6/20;)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Modern Auctions, Inc., Pur...))
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Scheduled Hearing Re Motion for Assignment Order) of 05/27/2020)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Scheduled Hearing Re Motion for Assignment Order))
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case))
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of 06/10/2020)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Default ("R")
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution of Judg...))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Ex Parte Application ...))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion to Continue the FSC and Trial)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint in BC696911)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Other - (RULING RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings: Ex Parte Application by defendant: For...))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice (of Bench Warrant and New Hearing Date for Third Party Examination of Denise Storck)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice (of Bench Warrant and New Hearing Date for Third Party Examination of Courtland Storck)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("R")
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Third Party Examination of Jason Cobb)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Sacramento))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (errata for correcting exhibit to ex parte application)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to stay execution of post judgment fees and costs)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 4/3/20 B305612)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to stay execution of post jud...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Judgment Debtor Examination)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to stay execution of post judgment in curred fees and costs)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Santa Barbara))
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to stay execution of post jud...))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order for Plaintiff to Fi...))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Appeal Document (NOA: 04/03/20-R B305612 ORDER DENYING MOTION APPELLANTS RELIEF OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B305612, NOA 3/6/20;)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/16/2020)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B305612)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order re: Related Cases and Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (For: (1) Resolution of Pending Litigation; and (2) Satisfaction of Judgment)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 04/03/20 B305612)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B305612)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to ex parte application to restrain sale of the table)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to restrain plaintiff from au...))
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 case))
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 case) of 06/11/2020)
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order Transferring Case)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/17/2020)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Third Party Examination of Denise Storck)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Third Party Examination of Courtland Storck)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to stay execution of judgment)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (;NOA 3/6/20;)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("R")
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 ("R")
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B305612, NOA 3/6/20;)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.