Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Office Of The General Counsel W F & Co, against Feroyan Garen, Bliss Cafe And Lounge, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa Sanchez presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management112 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2016 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-14T00:00:00Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: March 23, 2017Default Judgment
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: July 21, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 16, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.