Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Moda Kevin, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jacobson Brian Michael, Taheri Payman, against Brivanlou Pacoima Llc, Hakak Mahin, Harold Igdaloff Trustee Of The Igdaloff, represented by Aronoff Robert Charles, Rosenthal Shari Lynne, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen Duffy-Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management62 days |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions597 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time566 days |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - CIVIL
Date: February 23, 2017Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: July 26, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: July 31, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: August 01, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 29, 2021Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: May 24, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL
Date: July 13, 2016DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL
Date: July 13, 2016POSITION OF PLAINTIFF MODA RE MOTION TO BE RELIVED AS COUNSEL OF RAHIMI
Date: July 26, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: July 14, 2016OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2016OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE OF MAILIN HAKAK AND BRIVANLOU PACOIMA, LLC
Date: September 23, 2016NOTICE OF FILING OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 23, 2016OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEMURRER OF MAHIN HAKAK AND BRIVANLOU PACOIMA, LLC
Date: September 23, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; ETC.
Date: February 09, 2017OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 07, 2017REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF BRIVANLOU PACOIMA, LLC TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND ETC
Date: April 20, 2017OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO AMENDED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: August 07, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES OF $40,866.50; ETC
Date: October 04, 2017SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: November 08, 2017REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: December 08, 2017DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: December 26, 2017OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: February 13, 2018REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: February 15, 2018Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: March 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES / FILED BY DEFENDANT)
Date: August 17, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: August 20, 2020Order - ORDER ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: January 26, 2021Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: April 29, 2021Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: April 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: May 06, 2021Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: May 07, 2021Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: June 11, 2021Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: June 11, 2021Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: June 24, 2021AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 03, 2017SUMMONS ON THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 03, 2017COMPLAINT-CONTRACT -
Date: July 03, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 25, 2017Minute order entered: 2016-03-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-03-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-01 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-04 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY THF LAW OFFICE OF ROSARIO PERRY TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND ETC.
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: July 26, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: July 28, 2017OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO 1. NOTICE OF MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS-ADMITTED; ETC.
Date: August 01, 2017REQUEST FOR.JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: August 01, 2017REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO AMENDED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: August 07, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Writ-Other Issued
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Order (ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees / Filed by Defendant))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B285624)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (On Motion For Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: June 11, 2021Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: June 11, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 11, 2021Complaint
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-01 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-10 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-30 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-23 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.