Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Peluso Beverly, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Anerio V. Altman Esq., against K9 Loft Inc., Michalak Alicia Dvm, Mohawk Alley Animal Hospital Inc., Sabouri Alex, Tang Diana Dvm, (total of 7) See All represented by Sabzevar F. Michael Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management91 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time723 days |
Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: April 19, 2017DEFENDANT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; ETC
Date: June 06, 2017ORDER RE:MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: June 16, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-02-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: December 21, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: January 11, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.