Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lorensito Armando, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yazdanpanah Hesam Dean Esq., against Avelino Celestino, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1040 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 07, 2017Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: December 05, 2022Minute order entered: 2017-06-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure of Plaintiff to...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why This Action Should Not Be Dismiss...))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Plaintiff and/or Plaintiff's Coun...))
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT...))
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for...))
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) Bas...))
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to prosecute (C...))
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for...))
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Denying Request For Default Judgment without P...))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Application for default Judgment)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((Does 1-50 inclusive))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to prosecute (C...))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Denying Request for Default Judgment Without P...) of )
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT...))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Denying Request for Default Judgment Without P...))
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: DENYING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT ...) of )
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Denying Request For Default Judgment without P...) of )
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: DENYING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT ...))
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure of Plaintiff to...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Plaintiff and/or Plaintiff's Coun...))
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why This Action Should Not Be Dismiss...))
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) Bas...))
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Application for default Judgment)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to prosecute (C...))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Denying Request for Default Judgment Without P...))
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT...))
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to prosecute (C...))
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT...))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/24/2020)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Denying Request For Default Judgment without P...))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for...))
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for...))
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((Does 1-50 inclusive))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.