Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Saldana Erika, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aumais Christopher T., Aumais Christopher Terrence, Girardi Thomas V., against Recaro Child Safety Llc, represented by Baker Robert C., Thurston Adam J., Zurek Ronald, Predko Christopher J., Spencer Kenneth F, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management778 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions662 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-12-28T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Document:Application-Pro Hac Vice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (In Chambers Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Erika Saldana (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Application-Pro Hac Vice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Erika Saldana (Plaintiff); As to: Erika Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Erika Saldana (Plaintiff); As to: Recaro Child Safety, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ralph Refugio Garcia (Legacy Party)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Erika Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 10, 2017Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)
Date: March 12, 2019JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 09, 2017FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC
Date: March 10, 2017Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: April 14, 2017ANSWER OF DEFENDANT RALPH REFUGIO GARCIA TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 14, 2017RECARO NA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 17, 2017NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE HEARING FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 10, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 13, 2017ANSWER OF DEFENDANT RALPH REFUGIO GARCIA TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 22, 2017PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ERRATA TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2017Complaint
Date: 2015-12-28T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Application
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Updated -- Notice of Settlement: Filed By: Erika Saldana (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Erika Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: April 22, 2021Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Albert Martinez (Legacy Party)
Date: May 24, 2021Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Application (Verified Application of Ashley G. Chrysler to Appear Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise of Pending ...))
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In Chambers Court Order Regarding Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice (OF OSC RE SUBMISSION OF PROOF OF DEPOSIT INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to ...))
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 07/24/2019)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to ...))
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice (Of Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice (of filing attachment 19(b) 4 to Plaintiffs Petition for Minor's Compromise)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (Supplement to Petition for Establishing)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to ...))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to ...))
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice (Of Hearing)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In Chambers Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In Chambers Court))
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In Chambers Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearings)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In Chambers Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice ( of Court's Order)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((In Chambers Court Order) of 02/06/2020)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/08/2020)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re: Supplemental Amendment to Minor's Comprom...))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference to determine if the petitioner has filed pr...))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Order)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/22/2020)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)])
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Order on Hearing on Petition to confirm Minor's Compromise)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.