Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Anik Levent, Avalon Bay Communities Inc., Ralphs Grocery Company, Robertshaw Controls Company, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Sarkisyan Anoush, Sarkisyan Law Group, Taylor John Cornell, Zinder Koch & Mcbratney, against Asn Studio City Incorporated - Doe 4, Avalon Bay Communities Inc., Controladora Mabe S.A. De C.V. - Doe 1, Does 1 Through 200, Fabrica De Jabon La Corona, (total of 11) See All represented by Alden Eric Bernard, Garfinkel Gregg Steven, Harris Marc Scott, Macksoud Kori N., O'Dell Aaron Chase, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph M. Hammock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management427 days |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1209 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc North District |
Case Cycle Time386 days |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUMS )
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Cross-complaint (ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY dba INVENSYS CONTROLS VS. ROES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEE AND DEMAN FOR JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Response (TO THE MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS )
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-10 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Order (RE MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES )
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (OF DFNT AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel (out-of-state pltf to post an undertaking; )
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Ntc of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Notice (Of Posting Jury Fees )
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Order (TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED P.I. TO I.C. )
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00ExParte Application
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (CONTROLADOR MA, S.A. DE C.V. - DOE 1 )
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Opposition Document (to deft Ralphs' motion to compel out-of-state Levent Anik to post an undertaking; )
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANOUSH SARKISYAN, ESQ. )
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00ExParte Application
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00ExParte Application (TO CONTINUE THE HEARING FOR DEFT AVALON BAY )
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to motion to compel out-of-state pltf to post an undertaking; )
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOHN C. TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF PLTF LEVENT ANIK'S EX PARTE APPL )
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE STATUS CONFERENCE )
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER )
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANOUSH SARKISYAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL )
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel (ANSWERS AND FURTHER RESPONSES FROM NON-PARTY WITNESS TO NU TO-NGA TRUONG; SET )
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Reply (REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLTF POST AN UNDERTAKING )
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA )
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (OR, IN THE ALT, SUMMARY ADJUDICA- TION; SET ON )
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (SLEISER, S.A. DE C.V. - DOE 3 )
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Separate Statement on Und. Facts
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Complaint (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2017-06-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (ASN STUDIO CITY INCORPORATED - DOE 4 )
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRAD P. AVRIT )
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLTF TO POST AN UNDERTAKING )
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF RICHARD J. MARTIN )
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Order (EX PARTE ORDER CONTINUING DEFT. AVALON BAY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PREVIOUSLY SET , TO ; )
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Order (ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFTS. RALPHS FROM TO ; )
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00ExParte Application
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF STATUS CONFERENCE )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice, Association of Counsel
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00ExParte Application
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Separate Statement on Und. Facts
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00ExParte Application
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF TO NU TO-NGA TRUONG IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL )
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF HEARING )
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice (RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CON- FERENCE )
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice (RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00ExParte Application
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice (of submission on the court's tentative order)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALT, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 3)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's MIL No. 5 re Caption Page)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of FSC)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Stat...))
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for summary judgment)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Opposition (to defendant's Ralph's Grocery company motion for Summary judgment)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference
Date: 2018-09-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT RALP...))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Separate Statement on Opposition
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2018-09-01T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - JUDGE RALPH C. HOFFER )
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice (of errata re: plaintiff's opposition to defendant's Ralph's grocery company's motion)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 to Exclude Relationship History)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Vodka Bottle)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 2)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC: re MSC)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; 2) S...))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review Court Order Advancing the Final St...))
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 4)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 9)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 6)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 1)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 8)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 7)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Opposition (by Plaintiff to Defendant GE's MIL No. 1 re Richard Martin)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 5)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 to Exclude Evidence)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of FSC)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Stat...))
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to Exclude Evidence)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Trial Assignment))
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's MIL No. 6 to Exclude)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 to Exclude Evidence)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (re Good Faith Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendants Fabrica and Ralphs)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Palmer, Dept. 33, Central, OTR forthwith)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC re Dismissal)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice (of Filing of Avalon's Signature Page to Stip re Avalon's Good Faith Settlement w Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 13, 2019Order (to Withdraw Cash Bond)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Withdraw Cash Bond))
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 13, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: May 28, 2019Motion for an Order (REQUIRING PLTF TO POST AN UNDER- TAKING; SET ON )
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Declaration (OF PLAINTIFF, LEVENT ANIK )
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANOUSH SARKISYAN, ESQ. )
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Separate Statement on Und. Facts
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Order (EX PARTE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 05, 2018; )
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (MABE, S.A. DE C.V. )
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 13, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 29, 2016Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 22, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 17, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 10, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 29, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 24, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: December 09, 2016Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 17, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion for an Order
Date: June 28, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 18, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 19, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion
Date: March 26, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 30, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Motion -
Date: August 30, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: August 30, 2018Opposition - Opposition to motion for summary judgment
Date: October 19, 2018Opposition - Opposition to defendant's Ralph's Grocery company motion for Summary judgment
Date: October 19, 2018Reply - Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT RALP...)
Date: November 02, 2018Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Relationship History
Date: January 22, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence
Date: January 22, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Vodka Bottle
Date: January 22, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Plaintiff's MIL No. 5 re Caption Page
Date: February 11, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Plaintiff's MIL No. 6 to Exclude
Date: February 11, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence
Date: February 13, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: March 07, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Amendment to Complaint
Date: January 12, 2018Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUMS ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Response Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference Further Final Status Conference Conti...))
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel (out-of-state pltf to post an undertaking; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEE AND DEMAN FOR JURY TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Order (RE MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ) Filed by Court
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Summons Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Notice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Opposition Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Notice (Of Posting Jury Fees ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Order (TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED P.I. TO I.C. ) Filed by Court
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Summons Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANOUSH SARKISYAN, ESQ. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Motion for an Order Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Opposition Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRAD P. AVRIT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Motion for an Order (REQUIRING PLTF TO POST AN UNDER- TAKING; SET ON ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF RICHARD J. MARTIN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF PLAINTIFF, LEVENT ANIK ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (MABE, S.A. DE C.V. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Reply Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (SLEISER, S.A. DE C.V. - DOE 3 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Separate Statement on Und. Facts Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00ExParte Application Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Declaration Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Reply Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00ExParte Application Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Opposition Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant); FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Opposition Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant); FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Order Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Order Filed by FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Response Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Opposition Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant); FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Opposition Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Opposition Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Separate Statement on Und. Facts Filed by FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Motion Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Opposition Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00ExParte Application (TO CONTINUE THE HEARING FOR DEFT AVALON BAY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice (RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Reply Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00ExParte Application Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00ExParte Application Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Opposition Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of FSC) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; 2) S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 to Exclude Evidence) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Stat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Objection Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review Court Order Advancing the Final St...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT RALP...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of FSC) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for summary judgment) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 1) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to Exclude Evidence) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Stat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Separate Statement on Opposition Filed by FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 to Exclude Relationship History) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice (RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CON- FERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Vodka Bottle) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC: re MSC) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Reply Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Opposition Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Witness List Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 3) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 2) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 6) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC re Dismissal) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Palmer, Dept. 33, Central, OTR forthwith) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Withdraw Cash Bond)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (by Plaintiff to Defendant GE's MIL No. 1 re Richard Martin) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 4) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference Further Final Status Conference Conti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Order (to Withdraw Cash Bond) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 7) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Joinder Filed by ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY (Defendant); INVENSYS CONTROLS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: May 28, 2019Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's MIL No. 5 re Caption Page) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 9) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Trial Assignment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 5) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 8) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's MIL No. 6 to Exclude) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 to Exclude Evidence) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Cross-Complainant)
Date: May 13, 2019Witness List Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUMS )
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEE AND DEMAN FOR JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Cross-complaint (ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY dba INVENSYS CONTROLS VS. ROES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Response (TO THE MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS )
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant); FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Order Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Order Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Complaint (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Objection Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (ASN STUDIO CITY INCORPORATED - DOE 4 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANOUSH SARKISYAN, ESQ. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Order Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00ExParte Application Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (CONTROLADOR MA, S.A. DE C.V. - DOE 1 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Order (EX PARTE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 05, 2018; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Separate Statement on Und. Facts Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Order Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Opposition Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00ExParte Application Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Objection Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by LEVENT ANIK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Reply Filed by AVALON BAY COMMUNITIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Order (RE MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES )
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (OF DFNT AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel (out-of-state pltf to post an undertaking; )
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Notice (Of Posting Jury Fees )
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Opposition Document (to deft Ralphs' motion to compel out-of-state Levent Anik to post an undertaking; )
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to motion to compel out-of-state pltf to post an undertaking; )
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Order (TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED P.I. TO I.C. )
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Notice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER )
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE STATUS CONFERENCE )
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Summons Filed (CROSS-COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Motion for an Order (REQUIRING PLTF TO POST AN UNDER- TAKING; SET ON 07/21/17 )
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLTF TO POST AN UNDERTAKING )
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRAD P. AVRIT )
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF RICHARD J. MARTIN )
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANOUSH SARKISYAN, ESQ. )
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF PLAINTIFF, LEVENT ANIK )
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00ExParte Application (TO CONTINUE THE HEARING FOR DEFT AVALON BAY )
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOHN C. TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF PLTF LEVENT ANIK'S EX PARTE APPL )
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF STATUS CONFERENCE )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF HEARING )
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Declaration (OF TO NU TO-NGA TRUONG IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL )
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANOUSH SARKISYAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL )
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALT, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Notice (RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice (RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CON- FERENCE )
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - JUDGE RALPH C. HOFFER 9/21/2018 )
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for summary judgment)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (to defendant's Ralph's Grocery company motion for Summary judgment)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice (of errata re: plaintiff's opposition to defendant's Ralph's grocery company's motion)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT RALP...))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice (of submission on the court's tentative order)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Reply (REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLTF POST AN UNDERTAKING )
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (FABRICA DE JABON LA CORONA )
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Complaint (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (OR, IN THE ALT, SUMMARY ADJUDICA- TION; SET ON 03/02/18 )
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (ASN STUDIO CITY INCORPORATED - DOE 4 )
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (SLEISER, S.A. DE C.V. - DOE 3 )
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (MABE, S.A. DE C.V. )
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (CONTROLADOR MA, S.A. DE C.V. - DOE 1 )
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANOUSH SARKISYAN, ESQ. )
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Order (EX PARTE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 05, 2018; )
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review Court Order Advancing the Final St...))
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; 2) S...))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC: re MSC)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Stat...))
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to Exclude Evidence)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 to Exclude Evidence)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 to Exclude Relationship History)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Vodka Bottle)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Stat...))
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of FSC)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of FSC)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 4)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 3)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 1)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 9)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 5)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 6)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 2)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 7)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' MIL No. 8)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference Further Final Status Conference Conti...))
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's MIL No. 5 re Caption Page)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (by Plaintiff to Defendant GE's MIL No. 1 re Richard Martin)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (re Good Faith Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendants Fabrica and Ralphs)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice (of Filing of Avalon's Signature Page to Stip re Avalon's Good Faith Settlement w Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's MIL No. 6 to Exclude)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Trial Assignment))
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Palmer, Dept. 33, Central, OTR forthwith)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 to Exclude Evidence)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC re Dismissal)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Order (to Withdraw Cash Bond)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Withdraw Cash Bond))
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.