Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lundy Bruce, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Castranova Elia James, Cellino & Barnes L.C., against Mushyan Edward, Mushyan Seda, represented by Deenihan Matthew J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time498 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: April 26, 2017Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: October 28, 2016Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 26, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.